THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:10:01 AM
Bujak, Matthew Camil
CPSO#:
81453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bujak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 23 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
602-9639 137A St
Surrey BC V3T 4J1
Date Received: 01 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |