THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:01:24 AM
Naraghi, Ali Mohammad Faghihi
CPSO#:
81445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street Room 3MC421
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581 Ext. 2898
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 Aug 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Feb 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2014 |
|
Active |