THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:43:23 AM
Rofaeel, Ayman Sedki Hakim
CPSO#:
81443
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Mansoura University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaethesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. 2218
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 Jan 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYMAN SEDKI HAKIM ROFAEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFAEEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2011 |