THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:38:19 PM
Behjati, Mohammad Reza
CPSO#:
81419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 522-2119
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA BEHJATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHJATI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2011 |