THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:27:05 AM
Ola, Foluso Ayomitunde Olusegun
CPSO#:
81417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Benin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bioflax Medical Centre,
Unit 6, 121 Highway 20 East
Fonthill ON L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-7728
Fax: (905) 892-7811
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FOLUSO AYOMITUNDE OLUSEGUN OLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2004 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Ola’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Ola failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to maintain appropriate professional boundaries with these patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Ola is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover. It is further alleged that Dr. Ola engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, including for services not rendered; and providing and/or billing for services not clinically indicated
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)