THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:52:59 AM
Meineri, Massimiliano
CPSO#:
81414
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Turin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Massimiliano Meineri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Elizabeth St EN3
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 06 Jun 2019
Instructions/Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN 442
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |