THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:20:39 PM
Matanovic-Todorovic, Dragana
CPSO#:
81413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Nis, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 533-6962
Fax: (519)533-6963
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:21 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGANA MATANOVIC-TODOROVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATANOVIC-TODOROVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 18 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2014 |