THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:34:41 AM
Davallou, Mojgan
CPSO#:
81407
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, German
Education: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborugh Health network
2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 4054
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOJGAN DAVALLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVALLOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |