THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:39:06 AM
Durant, Dean Christopher Dalton
CPSO#:
81404
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Imaging and Ultrasound
3rd Avenue Belleville
Bridgetown BB11114
Barbados
Phone: 246-426-2750
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dean Christopher Dalton Durant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEAN CHRISTOPHER DALTON DURANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 29 Aug 2004
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |