THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:05:45 PM
Kamawi, Malalai
CPSO#:
81380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ahmadzai, Malalai (used until: 02 Jun 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pain care clinics
6981 Millcreek Drive Unite 2
L5N-6B8
Mississauga ,Ontario
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Phone: 289-724-7246
Fax: 289-914-2273
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALALAI KAMAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAWI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2008 |