THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:48:10 PM
Varapravan, Sreelatha Panicker
CPSO#:
81379
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
Assessment Program - H4
PO Box 5777, STN B
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47061
Fax: (519) 452-4552
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sreelatha Varapravan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SREELATHA PANICKER VARAPRAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARAPRAVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2009 |