THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:07:01 AM
Sherman, Maliha Ali Hass
CPSO#:
81376
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: University of Karachi, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
68 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Phone: (905) 662-2231
Fax: (905) 662-2233
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALIHA ALI HASS SHERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2007 |