THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:08:04 PM
Svystonyuk, Oleksandr Ivanovich
CPSO#:
81355
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Chernovzy Medical Institute, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 952-2885
Fax: (905) 952-2886
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLEKSANDR IVANOVICH SVYSTONYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SVYSTONYUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 16 Sep 2005
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2006 to 28 Feb 2006
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Clinical Pharmacology
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Clinical Pharmacology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2022 |