THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:38:15 PM
Abu Kuwaik, Ghassan Zohair Kamal
CPSO#:
81347
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Himachal Pradesh University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2389 Major Mackenzie Dr
Behavioural and Neuro-Developmental
Services (BANDS)
Maple ON L6A 3Z2
Phone: (416) 929-1919
Fax: (416) 929-1959
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GHASSAN ZOHAIR KAMAL ABU KUWAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU KUWAIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 May 2004 to 28 Jul 2004
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |