THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:15:10 AM
Carlisle, Maxine Alexis
CPSO#:
81328
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21 Sylvan St
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: 807-468-9861
Electoral District: 09
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAXINE ALEXIS CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 20 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 27 Aug 2007 to 24 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2023 |