THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:00:11 PM
Ali, Samia Hamid Ahmed
CPSO#:
81314
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 58439
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sudan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMIA HAMID AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 04 Apr 2010 to 03 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 04 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |