THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:51:30 AM
Erstling, Rachel Sara
CPSO#:
81271
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
167 Main St E
West Niagara Mental Health
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2
Phone: 905-309-3336
Fax: 905-309-4446
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Jul 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL SARA ERSTLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERSTLING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |