THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:45:35 PM
Hadlock, Shane David
CPSO#:
81258
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 688-2863
Fax: (613) 688-2864
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:18 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANE DAVID HADLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADLOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2010 |