THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:44:26 AM
Klurfan, Paula
CPSO#:
81243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
01 Apr 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Paula Klurfan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULA KLURFAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KLURFAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;
(2) Dr. KLURFAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KLURFAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KLURFAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KLURFAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KLURFAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Sep 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 16 Nov 2005 to 08 Feb 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 09 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2024 to 23 Jun 2024
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2024 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2024 |