THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:44:57 PM
Lansang, Maria Perla Lucila Estevez Tecson
CPSO#:
81238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of the Philippines, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:20 Jan 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA PERLA LUCILA ESTEVEZ TECSON LANSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANSANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Sep 2007
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 09 Mar 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2013 |