THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:49:23 AM
Shokri, Sharareh
CPSO#:
81234
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Urmia University of Medical Sciences Fac, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Eglinton Ave E
Suite 604
Eglinton Station Medical Centre
Toronto ON M4P 3A1
Phone: 416 485 0555
Fax: 416 485 2555
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sharareh Shokri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARAREH SHOKRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOKRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2023 |