THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:41:20 AM
Mirzaei, Ameneh
CPSO#:
81230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 315-532 Montréal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 4R4
Phone: 6136808777
Fax: 6136808599
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMENEH MIRZAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZAEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 29 Apr 2008 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2011 |