THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:47:12 AM
Kulkarni, Swati
CPSO#:
81220
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Gandhi Medical College, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Program
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Ext. 58000
Fax: (519) 253-4204
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:30 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SWATI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2008 |