THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:26:53 PM
Osman, Fahima Aden
CPSO#:
81212
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Somalian
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 304
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 446-7626
Fax: (416) 446-7625
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAHIMA ADEN OSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |