THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:50:09 PM
Reinders, Sabrina Mary Lim
CPSO#:
81209
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Reinders, Sabrina Lim (used until: 13 Oct 2010 )
Lim, Sabrina Mary (used until: 04 Nov 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network -Bickle
130 Dunn Ave, Toronto
Administrative Office
M6K 2R7
Toronto ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 2106
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. M. Lim Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SABRINA MARY LIM REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2006 |