THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:34:54 AM
Silverman, Gregory Lindsay
CPSO#:
81201
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept Anesthesia and Pain Management
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: GL Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY LINDSAY SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |