THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:41:04 PM
Sorg, Michael Konrad
CPSO#:
81192
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sorg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Cochrane Allergy Clinic
208 Third Avenue
Cochrane AB T4C 1A7
Tel: 403-981-3232
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:03 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |