THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:19:06 AM
Karah, Munia Mahmoud Abdelmajeed
CPSO#:
81184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Jul 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUNIA MAHMOUD ABDELMAJEED KARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 21 Jan 2005
PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 22 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2011 |