THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:10:51 PM
Taromi, Behzad
CPSO#:
81183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON L5C 1E3
Phone: (905) 306-1449
Fax: (905) 306-1450
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEHZAD TAROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAROMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2023 |