THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:40:14 PM
Sur, Smeeksha Singh
CPSO#:
81179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjab University India, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON L6R 3A5
Phone: (905) 458-6999
Fax: (905) 458-5202
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SMEEKSHA SINGH SUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 28 Jun 2004 to 25 Jul 2004
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2004 to 22 Aug 2004
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2005 |