THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:59:09 AM
Gupta, Kaveri
CPSO#:
81177
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Inland Hospital
311 Columbia Street
Kamloops, BC
V2C 2T1
Kamloops BC V2C 2T1
Phone: 250-374-5111
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kaveri Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:01 Oct 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAVERI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jan 2010
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |