THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:07:00 AM
Catton, Lianne Letitia
CPSO#:
81173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Porcupine Health Unit
169 Pine St South
Post Bag 2012
Timmins ON P4N 8B7
Phone: 705-267-1181
Fax: 705-264-3980
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lianne Catton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 7 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIANNE LETITIA CATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |