THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:49:53 AM
Onochie, Chinedu Peter Ifeanyichukwu
CPSO#:
81165
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Onochie, Chinedu Ifeanyi Peter (used until: 08 Jul 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3A
1605 Orleans Blvd
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Phone: (613) 841-8500
Fax: (613) 841-5310
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHINEDU PETER IFEANYICHUKWU ONOCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONOCHIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2010 |