THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:24:27 AM
Duff, Sharon Rose
CPSO#:
81162
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Seniors Mental Health Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St.
Hamilton Ontario, L8N 3K7
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36396
Fax: (905) 381-5613
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON ROSE DUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2010 |