THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:49:23 PM
Pinthus, Jehonathan Haim
CPSO#:
81148
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre & Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64902
Fax: (905) 381-7071
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:22 Apr 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |
|
Active |