THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:25:30 AM
Jimenez, Tomas Ygnacio
CPSO#:
81146
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON N5W 6A2
Phone: (519) 659-1122
Fax: (519) 659-8575
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:12 Nov 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOMAS YGNACIO JIMENEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIMENEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2006 |