THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:00:54 PM
Stewart, Andrew Edwin Fletcher
CPSO#:
81136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
335 Lancaster St W
Kitchener ON N2H 4V4
Phone: 5197467878
Fax: 18335961619
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW EDWIN FLETCHER STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 20 Apr 2008
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2008 to 18 May 2008
EL - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |