THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:16:26 PM
Bortnick, Jessica Eve
CPSO#:
81134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Oct 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA EVE BORTNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORTNICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2005 to 15 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2006 |