THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:06:37 PM
Sandhu, Charanjit Singh
CPSO#:
81125
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovaird Drive East, Unit 303
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Phone: (905)-792-6223
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARANJIT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |