THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:55:54 AM
Doyle, Crystal Rosanne
CPSO#:
81124
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise St.
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: 613 774 2422
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL ROSANNE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2014 |