THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:31:34 AM
Atkinson, Celia
CPSO#:
81121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Ext. 6616
Fax: (416) 469-6591
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CELIA ATKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2007 to 16 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2008 |