THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:17:20 PM
Valaris, Georgios
CPSO#:
81113
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek, Spanish
Education: Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor ON N9B 1J1
Phone: (519) 256-8000
Fax: 519-256-4707
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 2004 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
|
Active |