THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:22:26 AM
Mojab, Hamid
CPSO#:
81091
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shiraz University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 131
7163 Yonge Street
Markham ON L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597-0931
Fax: (905) 597-0951
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Aug 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMID MOJAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOJAB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Aug 2004
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2005 |