THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:23:18 AM
Leone, Karen Louise
CPSO#:
81090
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hogle, Karen Louise (used until: 21 Jun 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |