THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:58:52 AM
Weisberg, Lori Michelle
CPSO#:
81078
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
5G-39
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6591
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORI MICHELLE WEISBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 19, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Lori Michelle Weisberg was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: May 19, 2016
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; 1 year probation; Fine of $1200; Victim Surcharge of $360.