THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:24:21 PM
Cappello, Marie Lena
CPSO#:
81073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201-1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jul 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE LENA CAPPELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPPELLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Dec 2009 to 17 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2010 |