THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:36:00 PM
Tan, Jensen Chi Cheng
CPSO#:
81051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 782-2616
Fax: (416) 782-5899
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENSEN CHI CHENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |