THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:58:34 AM
Lingas, Rania Irene
CPSO#:
81034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B9
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:06 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANIA IRENE LINGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 07 Oct 2009 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2010 |