THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:03:43 PM
Lee, Jason Young
CPSO#:
81030
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lee, Jason (used until: 21 Dec 2011 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
9 MaRS Building Rm 9063
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 416.340.3855
Fax: 416.340.4500
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Y Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON YOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2011 |