THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:23:57 PM
Bakshi, Nupura Krishnadev
CPSO#:
81025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Krishnadev, Nupura (used until: )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Vista Eye Centre
2425 Bloor St West, Suite 513
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Toronto ON G6V4Z2
Phone: 4167608763
Fax: 6476892276
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NUPURA KRISHNADEV BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: March 27, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On February 20, 2018, the Maryland State Board of Physicians, with the agreement of Dr. Nupura Krishnadev (Bakshi), made a Consent Order finding that Dr. Krishnadev had not obtained all of the continuing medical education credits required under Maryland law contrary to the affirmation she signed in her renewal application that she had completed them. The Consent Order ordered Dr. Krishnadev to pay a fine of U.S.$900 and to obtain all of the required and outstanding education credits. The Maryland State Board of Physicians filed another Order on March 27, 2018 stating that the terms and conditions of the Consent Order had been satisfied. The College was notified of this finding by a report on April 10, 2018. ¬¬